LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB456
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB456
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB456
Compare Versions
SB456 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB456 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB456 Amended August 26, 2011
SB456 Amended August 15, 2011
SB456 Amended July 7, 2011
SB456 Amended May 2, 2011
SB456 Amended April 6, 2011
SB456 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB456 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB456 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB456 Amended August 26, 2011
SB456 Amended August 15, 2011
SB456 Amended July 7, 2011
SB456 Amended May 2, 2011
SB456 Amended April 6, 2011
SB456 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare