|
07/15/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 82, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2163.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1068.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 642.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|