LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB458
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB458
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB458
Compare Versions
SB458 Chaptered July 15, 2011
SB458 Enrolled July 1, 2011
SB458 Amended May 16, 2011
SB458 Amended April 4, 2011
SB458 Amended March 21, 2011
SB458 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB458 Chaptered July 15, 2011
SB458 Enrolled July 1, 2011
SB458 Amended May 16, 2011
SB458 Amended April 4, 2011
SB458 Amended March 21, 2011
SB458 Introduced February 16, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare