|
10/07/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 535, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/07/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2450.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 16. Page 3042.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Action rescinded and record expunged whereby a vote was taken. Read third time and amended. (Page 2710.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1240.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1117.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 864.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 619.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|