LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB468
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB468
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB468
Compare Versions
SB468 Chaptered October 7, 2011
SB468 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB468 Amended August 31, 2011
SB468 Amended August 26, 2011
SB468 Amended August 15, 2011
SB468 Amended July 13, 2011
SB468 Amended June 29, 2011
SB468 Amended June 20, 2011
SB468 Amended May 31, 2011
SB468 Amended May 17, 2011
SB468 Amended April 26, 2011
SB468 Amended March 29, 2011
SB468 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB468 Chaptered October 7, 2011
SB468 Enrolled September 13, 2011
SB468 Amended August 31, 2011
SB468 Amended August 26, 2011
SB468 Amended August 15, 2011
SB468 Amended July 13, 2011
SB468 Amended June 29, 2011
SB468 Amended June 20, 2011
SB468 Amended May 31, 2011
SB468 Amended May 17, 2011
SB468 Amended April 26, 2011
SB468 Amended March 29, 2011
SB468 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare