|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 730, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4960.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4877.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4746.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6124.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1177.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1013.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 850.) (May 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|