LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB477
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB477
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB477
Compare Versions
SB477 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB477 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB477 Amended July 3, 2012
SB477 Amended June 20, 2012
SB477 Amended June 11, 2012
SB477 Amended July 13, 2011
SB477 Amended June 22, 2011
SB477 Amended April 26, 2011
SB477 Amended April 13, 2011
SB477 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB477 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB477 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB477 Amended July 3, 2012
SB477 Amended June 20, 2012
SB477 Amended June 11, 2012
SB477 Amended July 13, 2011
SB477 Amended June 22, 2011
SB477 Amended April 26, 2011
SB477 Amended April 13, 2011
SB477 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare