|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2160.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2635.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 1035.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 742.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 560.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|