California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB484 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2011

Amended

Bill July 11, 2011
Bill June 8, 2011
Bill May 3, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011