|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 865, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Senate adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 5097.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly adopted Conference Committee report. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 6675.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Senators Correa, Gaines, and Lieu appointed to Conference Committee. From Conference Committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 4: Senators Lieu and Correa and Assembly Members Bonilla and Fong. Noes 1: Assembly Member Hagman. Page 4533.) (August 15.)
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Senators Correa, Dutton, and Lieu appointed to Conference Committee. Assembly Members Fong, Bonilla, and Hagman appointed to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Senate refused to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 2368.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Senate refused to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 2253.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Correa. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2253.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 2698.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 1173.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 853.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|