California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill August 15, 2011