|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 593, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2160.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 2635.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1275.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 1118.) (May 26). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 808.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|