LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB489
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB489
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB489
Compare Versions
SB489 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB489 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB489 Amended July 12, 2011
SB489 Amended June 30, 2011
SB489 Amended June 16, 2011
SB489 Amended May 11, 2011
SB489 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB489 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB489 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB489 Amended July 12, 2011
SB489 Amended June 30, 2011
SB489 Amended June 16, 2011
SB489 Amended May 11, 2011
SB489 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare