|
09/25/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 0. Page 5115.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6775.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1065.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 740.) (April 26).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|