LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB505
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB505
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB505
Compare Versions
SB505 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB505 Amended June 30, 2011
SB505 Amended May 3, 2011
SB505 Amended March 25, 2011
SB505 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB505 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB505 Amended June 30, 2011
SB505 Amended May 3, 2011
SB505 Amended March 25, 2011
SB505 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare