|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 644, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2461.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 3168.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2770.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (July 5).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 15. Page 1235.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1111.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 785.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
12/16/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 15.
|
|
|
|
12/15/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|