California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB51 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill July 11, 2011
Bill June 28, 2011
Bill May 31, 2011
Bill May 9, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011
Bill April 5, 2011