|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 630, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2230.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2694.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2091.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1282.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1118.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 644.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|