California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB537 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2011

Amended

Bill July 13, 2011
Bill June 23, 2011
Bill May 19, 2011
Bill March 21, 2011