California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB540 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2011

Amended

Bill September 1, 2011
Bill August 15, 2011
Bill July 12, 2011
Bill June 27, 2011
Bill May 12, 2011
Bill May 9, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011