LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB540
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB540
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB540
Compare Versions
SB540 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB540 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB540 Amended September 1, 2011
SB540 Amended August 15, 2011
SB540 Amended July 12, 2011
SB540 Amended June 27, 2011
SB540 Amended May 12, 2011
SB540 Amended May 9, 2011
SB540 Amended April 25, 2011
SB540 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB540 Chaptered September 30, 2011
SB540 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB540 Amended September 1, 2011
SB540 Amended August 15, 2011
SB540 Amended July 12, 2011
SB540 Amended June 27, 2011
SB540 Amended May 12, 2011
SB540 Amended May 9, 2011
SB540 Amended April 25, 2011
SB540 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare