|
09/26/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 341, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2150.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 2577.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 2512.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 568.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 496.) (March 29).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|