LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB565
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB565
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB565
Compare Versions
SB565 Chaptered September 26, 2011
SB565 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB565 Amended August 22, 2011
SB565 Amended July 7, 2011
SB565 Amended June 13, 2011
SB565 Amended May 23, 2011
SB565 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB565 Chaptered September 26, 2011
SB565 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB565 Amended August 22, 2011
SB565 Amended July 7, 2011
SB565 Amended June 13, 2011
SB565 Amended May 23, 2011
SB565 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare