|
10/08/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/14/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2414.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 2987.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2770.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 1242.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 846.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 543.) (April 4).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|