LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB567
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB567
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB567
Compare Versions
SB567 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB567 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB567 Amended September 1, 2011
SB567 Amended August 16, 2011
SB567 Amended April 11, 2011
SB567 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB567 Chaptered October 8, 2011
SB567 Enrolled September 12, 2011
SB567 Amended September 1, 2011
SB567 Amended August 16, 2011
SB567 Amended April 11, 2011
SB567 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare