|
10/09/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 711, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2645.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1037.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 762.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|