California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB583 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2011

Amended

Bill May 11, 2011
Bill May 2, 2011