|
09/22/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 312, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2252.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 2574.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2449.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1272.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1119.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 542.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|