LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB585
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB585
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB585
Compare Versions
SB585 Chaptered September 22, 2011
SB585 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB585 Amended August 18, 2011
SB585 Amended July 5, 2011
SB585 Amended May 31, 2011
SB585 Amended March 29, 2011
SB585 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB585 Chaptered September 22, 2011
SB585 Enrolled September 2, 2011
SB585 Amended August 18, 2011
SB585 Amended July 5, 2011
SB585 Amended May 31, 2011
SB585 Amended March 29, 2011
SB585 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare