|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. Veto sustained.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2150.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2594.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1217.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1086.) (May 23).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 862.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 579.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|