LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB586
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB586
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB586
Compare Versions
SB586 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB586 Amended August 15, 2011
SB586 Amended June 29, 2011
SB586 Amended May 27, 2011
SB586 Amended May 10, 2011
SB586 Amended April 25, 2011
SB586 Amended April 13, 2011
SB586 Amended March 21, 2011
SB586 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB586 Enrolled September 1, 2011
SB586 Amended August 15, 2011
SB586 Amended June 29, 2011
SB586 Amended May 27, 2011
SB586 Amended May 10, 2011
SB586 Amended April 25, 2011
SB586 Amended April 13, 2011
SB586 Amended March 21, 2011
SB586 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare