|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 240, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2017.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2345.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 9041.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 808.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|