California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB596 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2011

Amended

Bill July 7, 2011
Bill June 28, 2011
Bill May 2, 2011
Bill April 25, 2011