|
09/06/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 241, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2455.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1062.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 856.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|