LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB607
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB607
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB607
Compare Versions
SB607 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB607 Enrolled August 19, 2011
SB607 Amended April 27, 2011
SB607 Amended March 24, 2011
SB607 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB607 Chaptered September 6, 2011
SB607 Enrolled August 19, 2011
SB607 Amended April 27, 2011
SB607 Amended March 24, 2011
SB607 Introduced February 17, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare