|
09/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 307, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 4. Page 2145.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2508.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 895.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 846.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|