California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB608 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2011

Amended

Bill June 9, 2011
Bill June 7, 2011