07/14/2011 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 9. Page 2313.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
07/13/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
07/12/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
07/11/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 11). | |||
07/01/2011 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2162.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. | |||
06/23/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 22). | |||
05/19/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/09/2011 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/09/2011 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 896.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/02/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |||
04/26/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2011 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 640.) (April 13). | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/01/2011 | Set for hearing April 13. | |||
02/19/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |||
02/18/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |