LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB614
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB614
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB614
Compare Versions
SB614 Chaptered July 25, 2011
SB614 Enrolled July 14, 2011
SB614 Amended July 12, 2011
SB614 Amended July 1, 2011
SB614 Amended April 26, 2011
SB614 Amended April 6, 2011
SB614 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB614 Chaptered July 25, 2011
SB614 Enrolled July 14, 2011
SB614 Amended July 12, 2011
SB614 Amended July 1, 2011
SB614 Amended April 26, 2011
SB614 Amended April 6, 2011
SB614 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare