|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 266, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4634.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 4548.)
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Set for hearing August 15.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4490.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Joint Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5847.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on INS. and HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and INS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1231.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1120.) (May 26).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 885.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 808.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|