LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB615
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB615
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB615
Compare Versions
SB615 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB615 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SB615 Amended August 6, 2012
SB615 Amended June 18, 2012
SB615 Amended May 10, 2011
SB615 Amended April 13, 2011
SB615 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB615 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB615 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SB615 Amended August 6, 2012
SB615 Amended June 18, 2012
SB615 Amended May 10, 2011
SB615 Amended April 13, 2011
SB615 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare