|
08/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 141, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 1859.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2262.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 876.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 642.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|