California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB62 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 15, 2011

Chaptered

Bill August 1, 2011

Amended

Bill June 16, 2011
Bill May 26, 2011