California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB621 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2011

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2011

Amended

Bill June 28, 2011
Bill June 16, 2011
Bill March 31, 2011