LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB621
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB621
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB621
Compare Versions
SB621 Chaptered October 2, 2011
SB621 Enrolled September 8, 2011
SB621 Amended June 28, 2011
SB621 Amended June 16, 2011
SB621 Amended March 31, 2011
SB621 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB621 Chaptered October 2, 2011
SB621 Enrolled September 8, 2011
SB621 Amended June 28, 2011
SB621 Amended June 16, 2011
SB621 Amended March 31, 2011
SB621 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare