|
09/29/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 362, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2243.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2738.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Corbett. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 900.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 900.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 846.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 495.) (March 29).
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Set for hearing March 29.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|