California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB622 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2011

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2011

Amended

Bill June 22, 2011
Bill April 7, 2011