|
01/31/2012
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
Set for hearing January 19. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 949.) (May 10).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 785.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 558.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 5.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|