LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB63
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB63
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB63
Compare Versions
SB63 Amended May 17, 2011
SB63 Amended April 25, 2011
SB63 Amended March 16, 2011
SB63 Amended February 22, 2011
SB63 Introduced January 5, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
SB63 Amended May 17, 2011
SB63 Amended April 25, 2011
SB63 Amended March 16, 2011
SB63 Amended February 22, 2011
SB63 Introduced January 5, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare