|
08/31/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 200, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1911.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2344.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1065.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2011
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 863.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 642.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Set for hearing April 5.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected March 29.)
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|